Global Patent Index - EP 1240802 A2

EP 1240802 A2 2002-09-18 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A CONNECTING RELAY IN A RADIO COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A CONNECTING RELAY IN A RADIO COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER VERBINDUNGSWEITERSCHALTUNG IN EINEM FUNK-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA COMMANDE D'UN TRANSFERT DE COMMUNICATION DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION RADIO

Publication

EP 1240802 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00990551 A

Priority

  • DE 0004535 W
  • DE 19961516 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0147309A2] The invention relates to a radio communications system with a plurality of transmitter/receiver stations, wherein at a certain point in time, a first amount of said transmitter-receiver stations forms an active amount of stations which communicate with a mobile terminal device, when a requirement is detected after a connection has been relayed, and the active amount of stations is increased by at least one additional station. Thereafter, at least one station having the lowest transfer quality is removed from the active amount in order to close the connecting relay.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 36/18 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 36/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0147309A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0147309 A2 20010628; WO 0147309 A3 20020314; DE 19961516 A1 20010705; EP 1240802 A2 20020918; US 2003013448 A1 20030116; US 7039405 B2 20060502

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080702

2008-06-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DILLINGER, MARKUS

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LUO, JIJUN

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR