Global Patent Index - EP 1240822 A4

EP 1240822 A4 2002-11-27 - DIABETES ONSET MODEL MAMMAL

Title (en)

DIABETES ONSET MODEL MAMMAL

Title (de)

TIERMODELL FÜR BEGINNENDEN DIABETES

Title (fr)

MODELE MAMMIFERE DU DIABETE

Publication

EP 1240822 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00953502 A

Priority

  • JP 0005546 W
  • JP 29827399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1240822A1] An object of the present invention is to provide a model mammal for diabetes onset, being useful for elucidating the onset mechanism of diabetes caused by a blockage of signal transduction from insulin, and for the development of a remedy for said diabetes, and to provide a screening method of a remedy for said diabetes. A diabetic-prone transgenic mouse is prepared in a process comprising the steps of: a transgene that contains a Meg1/Grb10 gene, an imprinted gene exhibiting maternal expression, or a human GRB10 gene in the downstream of a chicken beta -actin promoter and in the upstream of a rabbit beta -globin poly A is constructed, and subsequently the transgene is microinjected into a male proneucleus of a mouse fertilized egg; thus obtained egg cell is cultured and then transplanted into an oviduct of a pseudopregnant female mouse; after rearing up the recipient animal, baby mice that have the above-mentioned cDNA are selected from the mice born from the recipient animal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01K 67/027; A61K 45/00; A61P 3/10; C12N 15/12; C12Q 1/02; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/15; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/85 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8509 (2013.01); A01K 67/0273 (2013.01); A01K 67/0275 (2013.01); C07K 14/4705 (2013.01); A01K 2207/15 (2013.01); A01K 2217/00 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A01K 2227/105 (2013.01); A01K 2267/03 (2013.01); A01K 2267/0306 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 0128321A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240822 A1 20020918; EP 1240822 A4 20021127; EP 1240822 B1 20060503; DE 60027767 D1 20060608; DE 60027767 T2 20070405; JP 2001112373 A 20010424; JP 4447705 B2 20100407; US 2004128707 A1 20040701; US 7271311 B2 20070918; WO 0128321 A1 20010426

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110818

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-06-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60027767

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110818

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100819

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100823

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60027767 P 20060608

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPAN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AGENCY

2006-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ISHINO, FUMITOSHI

2006-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MIYOSHI, NAOKI

2006-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ISHINO, TOMOKO

2006-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOKOYAMA, MINESUKE

2006-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WAKANA, SHIGEHARU

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPAN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AGENCY

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030829

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ISHINO, FUMITOSHI

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MIYOSHI, NAOKI

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ISHINO, TOMOKO

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOKOYAMA, MINESUKE

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WAKANA, SHIGEHARU

2002-11-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020419

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE