Global Patent Index - EP 1240834 A2

EP 1240834 A2 2002-09-18 - Method and device for wrapping rod-like articles with a wrapping strip

Title (en)

Method and device for wrapping rod-like articles with a wrapping strip

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Umhüllung von stabförmigen Artikeln mit Umhüllungsblättchen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour envelopper des articles en forme de tige avec une bande d'enveloppement

Publication

EP 1240834 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004637 A

Priority

DE 10112336 A

Abstract (en)

The method for encasing cylindrically formed tobacco (2) with cigarette papers (18) involves the tobacco together with the papers fed along a specific path to the commencement (20) of a rolling section (22) where the tobacco is wrapped in the papers. The papers before reaching the commencement of the rolling section and up to the time at which they reach that commencement are pressed against the tobacco. The tobacco is compressed by pressure of the papers to a diameter corresponding to that of entry at the commencement of the rolling section. The delivery speed of the cigarette papers is equal to that of a second press surface (34) of the press section.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Umhüllung von stabförmigen Artikeln (2), insbesondere von Zigarette-Filter-Zigarette-Gruppen, mit Umhüllungsblättchen (18), bei dem die Artikel zusammen mit den Umhüllungsblättchen entlang eines bestimmten Weges einem Beginn (20,120,220,320) einer Rollstrecke (22,322) zum Umrollen der Artikel mit den Umhüllungsblättchen zugeführt werden, und die Artikel ab dem Beginn der Rollstrecke entlang der Rollstrecke zu umrollen. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß die Umhüllungsblättchen vor Erreichen des Beginns der Rollstrecke bis zum Erreichen des Beginns entlang einer Pressstrecke (50,350) mit Anpressmitteln an die Artikel gepreßt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/47

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43K 19/00 (2006.01); A24C 5/08 (2006.01); A24C 5/47 (2006.01); B43K 19/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/471 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240834 A2 20020918; EP 1240834 A3 20040414; CN 1238222 C 20060125; CN 1375427 A 20021023; DE 10112336 A1 20020919; JP 2002335935 A 20021126; JP 3939174 B2 20070704; PL 352740 A1 20020923; US 2002129823 A1 20020919; US 7040325 B2 20060509

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080304

2005-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI