Global Patent Index - EP 1240835 A2

EP 1240835 A2 2002-09-18 - Smoking article with double or multilayered wrapper

Title (en)

Smoking article with double or multilayered wrapper

Title (de)

Rauchbarer Artikel mit einer zwei- oder mehrlagigen Umhüllung

Title (fr)

Article à fumer comprenant une enveloppe double ou multicouche

Publication

EP 1240835 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005355 A

Priority

DE 10112826 A

Abstract (en)

A smoking article with a bi- or multi-layer cover has one layer containing a reducing sugar involatile at room temperature and at least one other layer containing an N compound which forms ammonia during smoking.

Abstract (de)

Es werden rauchbare Artikel mit einer zwei- oder mehrlagigen Umhüllung beschrieben, wobei mindestens eine Lage mindestens einen reduzierenden Zucker enthält, der bei Umgebungstemperatur nicht flüchtig ist, und mindestens eine andere Lage mindestens eine Stickstoffverbindung enthält, die Ammoniak bei den Rauchtemperaturen und während der Dauer des Abbrandes des Artikels bildet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24B 15/28 (2006.01); A24B 15/30 (2006.01); A24D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24D 1/02 (2013.01); A24B 15/282 (2013.01); A24B 15/306 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240835 A2 20020918; EP 1240835 A3 20021106; DE 10112826 C1 20021031

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20020314

- Countries: SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20020314

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 24D 1/02 A, 7A 24B 15/28 B

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20020314