Global Patent Index - EP 1240841 A1

EP 1240841 A1 2002-09-18 - Unfolding clasp for interchangeable bracelet

Title (en)

Unfolding clasp for interchangeable bracelet

Title (de)

Faltverschluss für auswechselbares Armband

Title (fr)

Fermoir déployant pour bracelet de montre interchangeable

Publication

EP 1240841 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01106017 A

Priority

EP 01106017 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002125276A1] The folding clasp for an interchangeable watch strap comprises at least two arms articulated together and foldable against each other, provided with a fixing device to hold the clasp in closed position. The free end of one (1) of the arms (1, 3) is provided with a securement device for the end of a strap tongue (11) comprising a guide (8) having in cross-section a general U shape, an axle (9) connecting the two lateral wings of the guide (8) and holding members (10) adapted to coact with the upper surface of the tongue (11) of the strap. The free end of the other arm (3) of the clasp is pivoted on a cover (14) with the help of a screw (12), this cover (14) having lateral portions (13) interconnected by an axle (15). The cover (14) of the clasp comprises retaining members (16) adapted to coact with the upper surface of a second tongue (17) of the strap.

Abstract (fr)

Le fermoir déployant pour bracelet de montre interchangeable comporte au moins deux bras articulés entre eux et repliables l'un contre l'autre munis d'un dispositif de crantage pour maintenir le fermoir en position fermée. L'extrémité libre d'un (1) des bras (1,3) est munie d'un dispositif de fixation de l'extrémité d'un brin de bracelet (11) comportant un guide (8) présentant en coupe la forme générale d'un U, un axe (9) reliant les deux ailes latérales du guide (8) et des organes de maintien (10) destinés à coopérer avec la face supérieure du brin (11) du bracelet. L'extrémité libre de l'autre bras (3) du fermoir est pivotée sur un couvercle (14) à l'aide de vis (12), ce couvercle (14) présentant des parties latérales (13) reliées par un axe (15). Le couvercle (14) du fermoir comporte des organes de retenue (16) destinés à coopérer avec la face supérieure d'un second brin (17) du bracelet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/24; A44C 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/18 (2006.01); A44C 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/185 (2013.01); A44C 5/24 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3779 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4782 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0103952 A2 19840328 - ICI PLC [GB]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240841 A1 20020918; EP 1240841 B1 20041020; AT 279869 T 20041115; CN 1221196 C 20051005; CN 1374052 A 20021016; DE 1240841 T1 20030528; DE 60106560 D1 20041125; DE 60106560 T2 20050818; ES 2180466 T1 20030216; HK 1045926 A1 20050318; JP 2002272511 A 20020924; JP 3735299 B2 20060118; SG 101530 A1 20040130; TW 528584 B 20030421; US 2002125276 A1 20020912; US 6658707 B2 20031209

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160312

2016-09-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CARTIER INTERNATIONAL AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CARTIER CREATION STUDIO S.A., GENEVE, CH

- Document: DE 60106560

2016-09-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60106560

2016-09-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CARTIER INTERNATIONAL AG, CH

- Effective date: 20160805

2016-06-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20160602 AND 20160608

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI AND CIE SA, CH

2015-12-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: CARTIER INTERNATIONAL AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CARTIER CREATION STUDIO SA, CH

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-03-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050320

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL

- Effective date: 20050331

2007-12-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-09-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: CARTIER CREATION STUDIO SA

- Free text: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A.#10, ROUTE DES BICHES#1752 VILLARS-SUR-GLANE (CH) -TRANSFER TO- CARTIER CREATION STUDIO SA#8 BOULEVARD JAMES-FAZY#1201 GENEVE (CH)

2006-09-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-18 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1045926

2005-03-12 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050312

2005-03-12 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050312

2005-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-01-20 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-01-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050120

2004-12-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60106560 P 20041125

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-28 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

2003-02-07 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI