Global Patent Index - EP 1240842 A1

EP 1240842 A1 2002-09-18 - Airtight container, in particular for cosmetic products in powder with highly volatile components

Title (en)

Airtight container, in particular for cosmetic products in powder with highly volatile components

Title (de)

Luftdichter Behälter, insbesondere für pulverförmige kosmetische Produkte mit hohem Anteil an flüchtigen Inhaltsstoffen

Title (fr)

Récipient étanche à l' air, en particulier pour produits cosmetiques en poudre à haute teneur en composants volatiles

Publication

EP 1240842 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02356045 A

Priority

IT MI20010535 A

Abstract (en)

An airtight container, in particular for cosmetic products in powder, even with highly volatile components, composed of an element to contain the product, provided with an opening for the release of said content, and a lid (11) to close said opening. According to the present invention, between said lid (11) and the opening, which consists of a perforated surface (23) of the containing element, a sealing device (22) is inserted which prevents the product contained therein from leaking out. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 13/00; A45D 33/00; A47G 19/24; B65D 47/18; B65D 53/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/00 (2006.01); A45D 33/00 (2006.01); A45D 33/06 (2006.01); B65D 47/18 (2006.01); B65D 53/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/185 (2013.01); A45C 13/008 (2013.01); A45D 33/003 (2013.01); A45D 33/06 (2013.01); B65D 53/04 (2013.01); A45D 2200/051 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240842 A1 20020918; IT MI20010535 A1 20020916; US 2002158070 A1 20021031

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040504

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI