Global Patent Index - EP 1240843 A2

EP 1240843 A2 2002-09-18 - Hair removing apparatus with rotary roller

Title (en)

Hair removing apparatus with rotary roller

Title (de)

Haarentfernungsgerät mit drehbarer Rolle

Title (fr)

Appareil à épiler à rouleau rotatif

Publication

EP 1240843 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 02012787 A

Priority

  • EP 98902021 A
  • FR 9700224 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus has a case that holds a motor which rotates a roller round a central shaft (10). This moves behind a window in the case and has rows of tweezers which are each formed of parallel mobile blades (20) that are inserted between fixed blades (40). The blades are cross-shaped and one pair of arms (23) are curved longitudinally and the other pair of arms (23') are curved in the opposite direction. The blades are held in support plates (30) by the base of the arms (21,41). Cams (66,75) act on rollers (84) on discs (80,85) to move the blades longitudinally on the shaft.

Abstract (fr)

Appareil à épiler comprenant un boîtier prévu pour être tenu à la main et contenant un moteur d'entraînement pour un rouleau (1) mobile en rotation autour d'un arbre central (10) agencé derrière une fenêtre ménagée dans le boîtier, ce rouleau comportant une ou plusieurs rangées de pinces, chaque rangée étant formée d'une première série de lames (20) parallèles côte-à-côte mobiles et intercalées dans une seconde série de lames (40) également mobiles, les zones périphériques de pincement des lames étant décalées dans le sens axial par rapport aux bases des lames, ainsi que des moyens de commande(56-85) pour déplacer les lames mobiles en translation dans le sens longitudinal de l'arbre de telle sorte à les serrer contre les autres pour pincer les poils à arracher puis à les écarter. Conformément à l'invention, la première série de lames (20) est solidaire d'un baladeur central (10), et l'autre série de lames (40) est solidaire d'une cage (30/50/60) entourant le baladeur coaxialement, les moyens de commande (56-85) appliquant au baladeur et à la cage des mouvements en translation alternatifs respectivement en sens inversés. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 26/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 26/0028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2758060 A1 19980710; FR 2758060 B1 19990305; AU 5868298 A 19980803; BR 9804761 A 20000118; CN 1138495 C 20040218; CN 1187006 C 20050202; CN 1215981 A 19990505; CN 1500422 A 20040602; DE 69813407 D1 20030522; DE 69813407 T2 20040129; DE 69821807 D1 20040325; DE 69821807 T2 20050113; EP 0895453 A1 19990210; EP 0895453 B1 20030416; EP 1240843 A2 20020918; EP 1240843 A3 20021113; EP 1240843 B1 20040218; ES 2194301 T3 20031116; ES 2213724 T3 20040901; HK 1019545 A1 20040618; IL 126052 A 20010808; IL 126052 D0 19990509; JP 2000507145 A 20000613; US 6033416 A 20000307; WO 9830125 A1 19980716

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-21 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20170322

2017-01-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100106

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110224

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100105

2011-03-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110225

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090105

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090105

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090105

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080205

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080102

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2213724 T3

2004-04-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69821807 P 20040325

2004-02-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0895453 P

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 895453

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT