Global Patent Index - EP 1240847 A2

EP 1240847 A2 2002-09-18 - Toothbrush

Title (en)

Toothbrush

Title (de)

Zahnbürste

Title (fr)

Brosse à dents

Publication

EP 1240847 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02012748 A

Priority

  • EP 98956668 A
  • US 96829397 A
  • US 17799198 A

Abstract (en)

A toothbrush comprising: a handle; a head extending from the handle; and three tufts of bristles secured to the head, the tufts each being at an acute angle relative to an imaginary line which is tangent to or co-planar with a surface of the head through which the tufts are secured to the head, two of the three tufts differing in cross-section, the three tufts being angled and aligned substantially toward the same direction, the direction being substantially parallel with the handle, the direction being substantially towards or away from the handle, a first one of the three tufts having a length, a second one of the three tufts being adjacent to the first tuft and having a length shorter than the length of the first tuft, and a third one of the three tufts being adjacent to the first tuft and having a length shorter than the length of the first tuft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 5/02 (2006.01); A46B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/045 (2013.01); A46B 5/02 (2013.01); A46B 5/026 (2013.01); A46B 9/04 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923910 A1 19990520; AR 048240 A2 20060412; AT 233060 T 20030315; AU 1313799 A 19990531; AU 742959 B2 20020117; BR 9806247 A 20000125; CA 2271852 A1 19990520; CA 2271852 C 20040309; CN 1120682 C 20030910; CN 1241123 A 20000112; CZ 9901729 A3 19991215; DE 19881632 T1 19991028; DE 29823590 U1 19991007; DE 29823799 U1 20000824; DE 69811634 D1 20030403; DE 69811634 T2 20031023; DE 69811634 T3 20090514; EP 0955837 A1 19991117; EP 0955837 A4 20000719; EP 0955837 B1 20030226; EP 0955837 B2 20081022; EP 1240847 A2 20020918; EP 1240847 A3 20030212; EP 1240847 B1 20111221; ES 2192797 T3 20031016; ES 2192797 T5 20090301; GB 2333697 A 19990804; GB 9911198 D0 19990714; HU 0004254 A2 20010328; HU 0004254 A3 20011228; ID 21723 A 19990715; IL 129913 A 20020523; IL 129913 D0 20000601; JP 2001507981 A 20010619; JP 2008068108 A 20080327; JP 2008068109 A 20080327; JP 2008093449 A 20080424; JP 4069188 B2 20080402; NO 992417 A 19990716; NO 992417 D0 19990520; NZ 335854 A 20010629; PL 191797 B1 20060731; RO 120310 B1 20051230; RU 2228129 C2 20040510; SK 63899 A3 20000516; TR 199901208 T1 19991221; TW 538701 U 20030621

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171201

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171114

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171013

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171101

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171115

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171012

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121106

2014-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121106

2013-08-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-06-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111221

2013-01-17 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69842545

- Effective date: 20120924

2012-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120924

2012-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111221

2012-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120423

2012-06-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111221

2012-06-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PROCTER & GAMBLE BUSINESS SERVICES CANADA COMP, CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GILLETTE CANADA CO., MISSISSAUGA, CA

- Document: DE 69842545

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-06-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PROCTER & GAMBLE BUSINESS SERVICES CANADA COMP, CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GILLETTE CANADA CO., MISSISSAUGA, CA

- Document: DE 69842545

- Effective date: 20120413

2012-06-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PROCTER & GAMBLE BUSINESS SERVICES CANADA COMP, CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GILLETTE CANADA CO., MISSISSAUGA, ONTARIO, CA

- Document: DE 69842545

- Effective date: 20120413

2012-06-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PROCTER & GAMBLE BUSINESS SERVICES CANADA COMP, CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GILLETTE CANADA CO., MISSISSAUGA, ONTARIO, CA

- Document: DE 69842545

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111221

2012-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-04-24 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2379277 T3

- Effective date: 20120424

2012-03-28 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-03-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PROCTER & GAMBLE BUSINESS SERVICES CANADA COMPANY

2012-03-01 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69842545

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-01-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2012-01-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 537728 T

- Effective date: 20120115

2012-01-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOHEST AG

2012-01-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PROCTER & GAMBLE BUSINESS SERVICES CANADA COMPANY

- Free text: GILLETTE CANADA COMPANY#4 ROBERT SPECK PARKWAY#MISSISSAUGA, ONTARIO L4Z 4C5 (CA) -TRANSFER TO- PROCTER & GAMBLE BUSINESS SERVICES CANADA COMPANY#1959 UPPER WATER STREET SUITE 800#NOVA SCOTIA, HALIFAX B3J 2X2 (CA)

2011-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-12-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0955837 P

2011-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2011-12-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BEALS, DONNA

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROBERTS, MICHAEL

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WONG-PAREDES, MAISIE

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CASTILLO, BRADLEY

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MASTERMAN, THOMAS CRAIG

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 955837

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI