Global Patent Index - EP 1240851 A2

EP 1240851 A2 2002-09-18 - A connector

Title (en)

A connector

Title (de)

Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur

Publication

EP 1240851 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02253040 A

Priority

GB 0110564 A

Abstract (en)

A display stand connector comprises first and second parts (12,14). Each of the first part and second part comprises a planar element (20, 48). The planar elements are dimensioned so as to allow them to be sandwiched by closely lying plies of first and second members of a display stand. The planar element (20) of the first part (12) is arrangeable transversely to the planar element (48) of the second part (14) by slidable engagement. The first part comprises a raised portion (24) for locating through an opening in a ply of the first member. The first part (12) comprises engaging means to engage a ply of the first member of the display stand further to prevent planar movement of the planar element of the first part with respect to the first member of the display stand. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 47/06; A47F 5/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/06 (2006.01); A47F 5/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/06 (2013.01); A47F 5/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

GB 0110564 D0 20010620; GB 2371740 A 20020807; GB 2371740 B 20021218; EP 1240851 A2 20020918; EP 1240851 A3 20021023

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050610

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47B 47/06 A, 7A 47F 5/11 B, 7F 16B 12/46 B

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI