Global Patent Index - EP 1240852 A1

EP 1240852 A1 2002-09-18 - Mattress

Title (en)

Mattress

Title (de)

Matratze

Title (fr)

Matelas

Publication

EP 1240852 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01870048 A

Priority

EP 01870048 A

Abstract (en)

The mattress comprises a layer of visco-elastic foam (1). A first resilient fabric (2) partially covers a first face of the foam and a second fabric (3) partially covers the second opposite face of the foam. Sewing points (4) extending between the two fabrics pass through the foam layer.

Abstract (fr)

Couche ou matelas comprenant : une couche en mousse viscoélastique (1) d'une épaisseur supérieure à 1 cm, en particulier supérieure à 1,5 cm, de préférence comprise entre 1,6 et 10cm, ladite mousse présentant deux faces opposées, un premier tissu élastique (2) recouvrant au moins partiellement une première face de la couche en mousse viscoélastique, un deuxième tissu élastique ou non (3), avantageusement élastique, recouvrant au moins partiellement la deuxième face de la couche qui est opposée à la première face, et des points de coutures (4) s'étendant entre ledit premier tissu élastique et ledit deuxième tissu en traversant la couche de mousse viscoélastique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/14; A47C 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/00 (2006.01); A47C 27/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/002 (2013.01); A47C 27/146 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5974994 A 19991102 - STUTZNAECKER KLAUS [DE], et al

Citation (search report)

[A] US 4748768 A 19880607 - JACOBSEN POUL E B [DK]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240852 A1 20020918; EP 1240852 B1 20041103; EP 1240852 B2 20090527; AT 281103 T 20041115; DE 60106862 D1 20041209; DE 60106862 T2 20051201; DE 60106862 T3 20091203; DK 1240852 T3 20050314; DK 1240852 T4 20090914; ES 2232586 T3 20050601; ES 2232586 T5 20091102; PT 1240852 E 20050331

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180305

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180328

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20180314

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170206

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20170203

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2009-11-02 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2009-11-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2009-09-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090402142

2009-09-14 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2009-09-08 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2009-08-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20090527

2009-05-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: BREVET MAINTENU DANS UNE FORME MODIFIEE

2009-05-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090527

2009-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: TEMPUR PEDIC INTERNATIONAL INC

2005-09-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TEMPUR PEDIC INTERNATIONAL INC

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232586 T3

2005-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400430

2005-03-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-03-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050214

2005-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2005-02-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60106862 P 20041209

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI