Global Patent Index - EP 1240853 A1

EP 1240853 A1 2002-09-18 - Infant carrier

Title (en)

Infant carrier

Title (de)

Kindertrage

Title (fr)

Porte bébé modulaire

Publication

EP 1240853 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02356047 A

Priority

FR 0103647 A

Abstract (en)

The baby carrier comprises a back baby carrier (3) which receives a front baby carrier (2) inside it. The two baby carriers have temporary fixings and connections allowing the front baby carrier to be separated and used independently. On its front face (2a) the front baby carrier has a rigidified (2c) cap shape (2b) which can be adjusted and positioned on the upper part (3a) of the front face of the back baby carrier carrying frame (3b).

Abstract (fr)

Ce porte-bébé est caractérisé en ce qu'il est modulaire et est constitué d'un porte-bébé dorsal (3) agencé pour recevoir intérieurement un porte-bébé ventral (2), les deux porte-bébés étalit agencés avec des moyens de liaison et de fixation temporaire permettant soit la séparation du porte-bébé ventral et son utilisation indépendante, soit son intégration en vue du portage de l'enfant en très bas âge dans le porte-bébé dorsal. D'une manière spécifique le porte-bébé ventral est agencé sur sa face de devant (2a) avec une forme en coiffe (2b) présentant des moyens de rigidification (2c) et susceptible de s'ajuster et se positionner sur la partie supérieure (3a) de la face avant de l'ossature portante (3b) du porte-bébé dorsal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47D 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47D 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47D 13/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240853 A1 20020918; EP 1240853 B1 20050831; DE 60205793 D1 20051006; DE 60205793 T2 20060223; FR 2822042 A1 20020920; FR 2822042 B1 20030516; US 2002130148 A1 20020919; US 6715651 B2 20040406

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080307

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080307

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080307

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-03-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-03-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070312

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050928

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60205793 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2005-08-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI