Global Patent Index - EP 1240856 A1

EP 1240856 A1 2002-09-18 - Hanging device, especially for sales display

Title (en)

Hanging device, especially for sales display

Title (de)

Aufhänger, insbesondere für Verkaufspräsentationsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Organe de suspension notamment pour présentoir de magasin

Publication

EP 1240856 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290311 A

Priority

FR 0102242 A

Abstract (en)

The hanging system for display rails comprises a claw (1) at the end of the rail. This has a U-shaped section (12) at the top, which fits over the mounting rail (2) and inward-facing steps (111, 112) on its front surface.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un organe de suspension, notamment pour présentoir de magasin du type constitué d'une patte dont l'une des extrémités est conformée pour définir avec le corps de la patte proprement dit, une aile d'accrochage ayant sensiblement la forme d'un U. L'organe de fixation est caractérisé en ce que le corps de la patte présente au voisinage de l'extrémité opposée à l'aile d'accrochage (12), au moins deux zones d'appui (111, 112) décalées l'une par rapport à l'autre et orientées vers l'intérieur de ladite patte (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/0838 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2820962 A1 20020823; FR 2820962 B1 20030411; EP 1240856 A1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040209

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES IT LI PT

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NICAIZE, DOMINIQUE

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020219

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI