Global Patent Index - EP 1240857 A1

EP 1240857 A1 2002-09-18 - Belt display device

Title (en)

Belt display device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Ausstellen von Gürteln

Title (fr)

Présentoir pour ceintures

Publication

EP 1240857 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01128342 A

Priority

IT MI20010522 A

Abstract (en)

A device for displaying belts of the type equipped with a supporting plate (2) and securing means (3) for the belt in which the securing means comprise a tab (5) to lock the buckle of the belt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/12; A47F 7/024

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/024 (2006.01); A47F 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/12 (2013.01); A47F 7/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240857 A1 20020918; IT MI20010522 A1 20020913

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061024

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040908

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI