Global Patent Index - EP 1240859 A2

EP 1240859 A2 2002-09-18 - Attachment to apply to clothes hangers for clothes with shoulders

Title (en)

Attachment to apply to clothes hangers for clothes with shoulders

Title (de)

Schulterträger zum Anbringen an einem Kleiderbügel

Title (fr)

Support d'épaule à attacher à un cintre

Publication

EP 1240859 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02005028 A

Priority

IT VI20010058 A

Abstract (en)

Concerns an attachment to apply to clothes hangers for shouldered clothing, to hang clothing with both fitted and soft shoulders. Such an attachment is characterised in that it comprises two shaped bodies, which affix onto the two ends of the arch of the clothes hanger, so as to constitute two shaped small shoulders. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240859 A2 20020918; EP 1240859 A3 20040825; IT VI20010058 A1 20020913

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050226

2005-06-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-05-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI