Global Patent Index - EP 1240862 A2

EP 1240862 A2 2002-09-18 - Assembled shower tray in plastic material with polystyrene foam sintered onto it

Title (en)

Assembled shower tray in plastic material with polystyrene foam sintered onto it

Title (de)

Verbundduschtasse aus Kunstoff mit einen darauf gesintertem Polystyrolschaumkern

Title (fr)

Assemblage de cuvette de douche en matériau plastique avec un noyau en mousse de polystyrène fritté sur lui

Publication

EP 1240862 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02005604 A

Priority

IT PD20010062 A

Abstract (en)

The invention is a new assembled shower tray comprising a shower tray, or upper layer, made of thermoformed plastic material and a bottom layer made of polystyrene sintered and/or foamed directly onto said plastic material. The polystyrene saturates all the space under the thermoformed plastic tray and is provided with a hole in correspondence with the drainage hole, so as to allow the connection of said hole in the shower tray to the drainage system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240862 A2 20020918; EP 1240862 A3 20031105; IT PD20010062 A1 20020916

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081103

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040503

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI