Global Patent Index - EP 1240882 A2

EP 1240882 A2 2002-09-18 - Stick for sightless people

Title (en)

Stick for sightless people

Title (de)

Blindenstock

Title (fr)

Canne pour aveugle

Publication

EP 1240882 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02425154 A

Priority

IT FI20010041 A

Abstract (en)

The invention refers to a stick for sightless people, the stick being of a type comprising a handle (3), a body (1), a ferrule (2), and connection means for connecting said elements to each other; the ferrule (2) consists of a hollow, substantially spherical body (20) possibly made up of more parts and provided with a coupling portion (21) to allow the attachment thereof to the stick (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 3/06 (2006.01); A61H 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 3/068 (2013.01); A61H 3/0288 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240882 A2 20020918; EP 1240882 A3 20021218; IT FI20010041 A1 20020916

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI