Global Patent Index - EP 1240946 A2

EP 1240946 A2 2002-09-18 - Impact mill with pivotable impact apron

Title (en)

Impact mill with pivotable impact apron

Title (de)

Prallmühle mit verschwenkbarem Prallwerk

Title (fr)

Broyeur à impact avec écran d' impact orientable

Publication

EP 1240946 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005480 A

Priority

DE 10112959 A

Abstract (en)

The rebound crusher has a linear transmission (8) installed to lie approximately parallel to the cover plate (6) of the casing (1) and is connected to a lever (11) guided through the cover plate and rigidly connected to the impact mechanism (4). The lever is constructed in circle segment form and the middle point of the circle corresponds to the pivot point (5). The lever may be constructed as a bell crank, and the linear transmission as a cylinder and piston unit.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Prallmühle mit mindestens einem mit Schlagleisten (2) versehenen Rotor (3), der drehbar in einem Mühlengehäuse (1) gelagert ist und mit mindestens einem Prallwerk (4) zusammenwirkt, das verschwenkbar im Mühlerngehäuse angeordnet und mittels eines Lineargetriebes (8), zum Beispiel eines hydraulischen Zylinderkolbenaggregates (9), stufenlos verstellbar ist, so daß das der Schwenkachse (5) gegenüberliegende Ende des Prallwerkes (4) auf den Rotor zu einstellbar ist. Das Lineargetriebe ist auf der Deckplatte (6) des Mühlengehäuses (1) angeordnet. Erfindungsgemäß ist das Lineargetriebe (8) in etwa parallel zur Deckplatte liegend angeordnet und greift an einem durch die Deckplatte geführten Hebel (11), der mit dem Prallwerk (4) fest verbunden ist, an, Fig. 1. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 13/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/095 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240946 A2 20020918; EP 1240946 A3 20030108; AU 2319402 A 20020919; DE 10112959 A1 20021002; MX PA02002721 A 20041112; US 2002139880 A1 20021003; US 6745966 B2 20040608; ZA 200202052 B 20021004

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061003

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI