Global Patent Index - EP 1240958 A2

EP 1240958 A2 2002-09-18 - Arrangement for the supply of a molten copper alloy

Title (en)

Arrangement for the supply of a molten copper alloy

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Abgiessen einer aus einer Kupferlegierung bestehenden Giessschmelze

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour couler un alliage fondu de cuivre

Publication

EP 1240958 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005162 A

Priority

DE 10112621 A

Abstract (en)

Assembly for pouring a molten copper alloy metal (3) has a smelting furnace (1) which tilts around a horizontal swing axis (2) with a pouring tube (4). The molten metal is poured under a protective gas atmosphere (9) at the casting end (5) of a pouring spout (6) and the outlet end of the pouring spout of an ingot mold. A hood (7) shrouds the molten metal against the atmosphere, and the entry for the pouring spout at the hood has a seal (8) with a swing movement.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anordnung zum Abgießen einer aus einer Kupferlegierung bestehenden Gießschmelze (3), welche einen um eine horizontale Schwenkachse (2) schwenkbaren Schmelzofen (1) mit einem Gießschmelze (3) abführenden Abgußrohr (4) umfaßt, durch welches die Gießschmelze (3) unter Schutzgasatmosphäre (9) einem Eingußende (5) einer Gießrinne (6) und über einen Auslauf der Gießrinne (6) einer Kokille zuführbar ist. Dabei ist das das Eingußende (5) der Gießrinne (6) von einer die Gießschmelze (3) gegen die Atmosphäre abdichtenden Haube (7) abdeckbar, wobei das Abgußrohr (4) unter Eingliederung einer Dichtungsanordnung (8) schwenkbeweglich in die Haube (7) eingreift. Die Gießschmelze (3) ist dadurch beim Verschwenken des Schmelzofens (1) und des Abgußrohrs (4) unter Schutzgasatmosphäre (9) in die Gießrinne (6) überführbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/103; B22D 11/106

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 11/103 (2006.01); B22D 11/106 (2006.01); B22D 21/00 (2006.01); B22D 23/00 (2006.01); B22D 35/04 (2006.01); F27D 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/106 (2013.01); B22D 11/103 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240958 A2 20020918; EP 1240958 A3 20030102; CN 1382545 A 20021204; DE 10112621 A1 20020919; HU 0200966 A2 20020928; HU 0200966 A3 20030228; HU 0200966 D0 20020529; JP 2002283042 A 20021002; KR 100864465 B1 20081022; KR 20020073299 A 20020923; PL 352768 A1 20020923; TW 531458 B 20030511; US 2002130449 A1 20020919; US 6602461 B2 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI