Global Patent Index - EP 1240986 A2

EP 1240986 A2 2002-09-18 - Press-cutting device with suction and blowing means

Title (en)

Press-cutting device with suction and blowing means

Title (de)

Stanzanordnung mit Absaug- sowie Gebläseeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de découpage ayant des moyens pour aspirer et souffler

Publication

EP 1240986 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005516 A

Priority

DE 20104247 U

Abstract (en)

The offset printing machine is combined with a stamping machine (1), which makes holes in a printed piece of paper. There is a large drum (2), carrying e.g. two stamping tools (4) with sharp edges. The tools press the paper sheets (6) against a smaller pressure drum (3), so that the sharp edges cut through the paper. The rotation of the drum then carries the paper under a suction hood (8) with nozzles (30) for pressurized air at the sides.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Stanzanordnung (1), die zum Stanzen von in einer Offset-Bogendruckmaschine mit wenigstens einem Druckwerk bedruckten Bogen (6) wenigstens ein Stanzwerkzeug (4) umfaßt, ist zur Vermeidung einer von Hand durchzuführenden Nachbearbeitung das Stanzwerkzeug (4) so ausgebildet, daß es den betreffenden Stanzling völlig freistanzt, und sind weiterhin eine mit Unterdruck arbeitende Absaugeinrichtung (11) für die Stanzlinge und eine Gebläseeinrichtung (14) vorgesehen, von denen letztere den bedruckten Bogen (6) während des Absaugens mit Hilfe eines Gasstroms an einer Anlagefläche stabilisiert. Die Absaugeinrichtung (11) und die Gebläseeinrichtung (14) sind während des Betriebs feststehend angeordnet, zur Anpassung an unterschiedliche Stanzlingspositionen und -größen jedoch verstellbar ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/18; B26D 7/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 19/00 (2006.01); B26D 7/01 (2006.01); B26D 7/18 (2006.01); B41F 13/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/1863 (2013.01); B41F 13/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20104247 U1 20010906; AT 341428 T 20061015; CZ 20020886 A3 20021016; CZ 297940 B6 20070502; DE 50208301 D1 20061116; EP 1240986 A2 20020918; EP 1240986 A3 20040519; EP 1240986 B1 20061004; EP 1240986 B2 20100127

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUEBER, PETER, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ODN DRUCK UND MEDIENSERVICE GMBH & CO. KG, 90571 SCHWAIG, DE

- Document: DE 50208301

2015-06-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUEBER, PETER, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OFFSETDRUCK NUERNBERG GMBH & CO. PAPIERVERARBEITUNGS-KG, 90411 NUERNBERG, DE

- Document: DE 50208301

2015-06-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50208301

- Representative's name: STROHSCHAENK UND KOLLEGEN, DE

2015-06-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50208301

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE STROHSCHAENK, URI, STRASSER & K, DE

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130311

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130311

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130311

2013-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 341428 T

- Effective date: 20130311

2013-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120321

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: OFFSETDRUCK NUERNBERG GMBH & CO. PAPIERVERARBEITU

- Free text: OFFSETDRUCK NUERNBERG GMBH & CO. PAPIERVERARBEITUNGS-KG#REICHSWALDSTRASSE 52#90571 SCHWAIG BEI NUERNBERG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- OFFSETDRUCK NUERNBERG GMBH & CO. PAPIERVERARBEITUNGS-KG#REICHSWALDSTRASSE 52#90571 SCHWAIG BEI NUERNBERG (DE)

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070312

2010-01-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2010-01-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20100127

2010-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2010-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV RO SI

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070311

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070525

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070105

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: OFFSETDRUCK NURNBERG G.M.B.H. & CO. PAPIERVERARBE

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-08-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHOBER GMBH

- Effective date: 20070626

2007-06-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-05-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-03-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20061004

2007-03-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070316

2007-01-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2007-01-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070115

2007-01-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070104

2007-01-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070104

2006-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50208301 P 20061116

2006-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV RO SI

2006-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2006-10-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2006-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2006-10-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2006-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WIMMER, EUGENC/O OFFSETDRUCK NUERNBERG GMBH & CO.

2006-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUECK, THOMASC/O OFFSETDRUCK NUERNBERG GMBH & CO.

2006-01-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OFFSETDRUCK NUERNBERG GMBH & CO. PAPIERVERARBEITU

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-02-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-02-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041107

- Countries: LT

2005-02-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041107

- Countries: LV

2005-02-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041107

- Countries: RO

2005-02-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041107

- Countries: SI

2005-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041107

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI