Global Patent Index - EP 1240998 A2

EP 1240998 A2 2002-09-18 - System for the compensation of dosing errors in multi-cavity briquetting presses en particulier for single-layer briquettes or the like

Title (en)

System for the compensation of dosing errors in multi-cavity briquetting presses en particulier for single-layer briquettes or the like

Title (de)

System zur Kompensation von Dosierungsfehlern für Mehrkammer-Brikettierpressen insbesondere für monoschichtige Briketts oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Système de compensation des erreurs de dosage sur des presses pour briquettes à plusieurs cavités, en particulier pour briquettes monocouches ou similaires

Publication

EP 1240998 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 02425135 A

Priority

IT FI20010043 A

Abstract (en)

Between the pressure plate (7) and each plug (9) located underneath is interposed an elastomer layer (25) which ensures a sufficient pressing of the material into the different briquette cavities.

Abstract (fr)

Entre la plaque de pression (7) et chacun des tampons (9) situés au-dessous est interposée une couche élastomère (25) associée à chaque tampon (9), qui assure un pressage suffisant de la matière dans les différentes cavités. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 15/06; B28B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/02 (2006.01); B30B 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/021 (2013.01); B30B 15/061 (2013.01); B30B 15/067 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1240998 A2 20020918; EP 1240998 A3 20030709; EP 1240998 B1 20050928; DE 60206311 D1 20060209; DE 60206311 T2 20060629; ES 2246383 T3 20060216; IT FI20010043 A1 20020916

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180403

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GE.BI.LON. GESTIONE BREVETTI & IMMOBILI LONGIN, IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LONGINOTTI MECCANICA S.R.L., SESTO FIORENTINO, IT

- Document: DE 60206311

- Effective date: 20120920

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GE.BI.LON. GESTIONE BREVETTI & IMMOBILI LONGIN, IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LONGINOTTI MECCANICA S.R.L., SESTO FIORENTINO, FIRENZE, IT

- Document: DE 60206311

- Effective date: 20120920

2012-11-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60206311

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL - PARTNERSCHAFT VON PATENT- U, DE

- Effective date: 20120920

2012-11-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60206311

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL PARTNERSCHAFT MBB VON PATENT-, DE

- Effective date: 20120920

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2246383 T3

2006-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60206311 P 20060209

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI