Global Patent Index - EP 1241012 A2

EP 1241012 A2 2002-09-18 - Ink tank cartridge and container therefor

Title (en)

Ink tank cartridge and container therefor

Title (de)

Tintenkartusche und Behälter dafür

Title (fr)

Cartouche d'encre et réservoir correspondant

Publication

EP 1241012 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02076904 A

Priority

  • EP 00200827 A
  • EP 97200694 A
  • JP 1283492 A
  • JP 3222692 A
  • JP 5815192 A
  • JP 19340292 A

Abstract (en)

An ink tank cartridge for an ink-jet type recording apparatus, the cartridge being removably mounted onto an ink supply needle (14, 90) having through holes (36, 94) of the recording apparatus, the cartridge comprising: a housing (11, 50); a porous member (21, 64) accommodated in said housing for being impregnated with an ink; an ink supply port (15, 53, 71) formed in a bottom surface of said housing, said ink supply port having an upper opening (16, 54) facing said porous member and a lower opening directing away from the bottom of said housing; characterised by: packing means (19, 57, 73) provided within said ink supply port, said packing means being arranged to abut resiliently against an outer periphery of said ink supply needle; and sealing means (20, 60, 77) comprising a thin film bonded to the lower opening of the ink supply port for sealing the opening and for being penetrated by said ink supply needle. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17533 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B41J 2/17523 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0553535 A1 19930804; EP 0553535 B1 19981028; EP 0553535 B2 20040414; DE 69227441 D1 19981203; DE 69227441 T2 19990318; DE 69227441 T3 20040909; DE 69232194 D1 20011213; DE 69232194 T2 20020718; DE 69232243 D1 20020110; DE 69232243 T2 20020725; DE 69232893 D1 20030213; DE 69232893 T2 20031106; DE 69233371 D1 20040722; DE 69233371 T2 20050616; DE 69233784 D1 20100610; EP 0782927 A1 19970709; EP 0782927 B1 20011107; EP 0786352 A1 19970730; EP 0786352 B1 20011128; EP 1013444 A1 20000628; EP 1013444 B1 20030108; EP 1241012 A2 20020918; EP 1241012 A3 20030102; EP 1241012 B1 20040616; EP 1396344 A2 20040310; EP 1396344 A3 20040728; EP 1905599 A2 20080402; EP 1905599 A3 20090408; EP 1905599 B1 20100428; HK 1002449 A1 20020419; HK 1010709 A1 20000505; HK 1021810 A1 20020920; HK 1025932 A1 20030815; HK 1046666 A1 20050204; SG 46602 A1 19980220

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120806

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120808

2012-08-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20120806

2012-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-08-15 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20120807

2012-08-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69233371

2012-08-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69233371

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110803

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110818

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110803

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION

- Free text: SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION#4-1, NISHI-SHINJUKU 2-CHOME#SHINJUKU-KU, TOKYO (JP) -TRANSFER TO- SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION#4-1, NISHI-SHINJUKU 2-CHOME#SHINJUKU-KU, TOKYO (JP)

2007-01-12 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-04 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1046666

2004-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-10-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69233371 P 20040722

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1013444 P

2004-06-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0786352 P

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 786352

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1013444

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE