Global Patent Index - EP 1241033 A8

EP 1241033 A8 2002-11-20 - DIMMING DEVICE FOR AN AIRCRAFT WINDOW

Title (en)

DIMMING DEVICE FOR AN AIRCRAFT WINDOW

Title (de)

ABBLENDEEINRICHTUNG FÜR LUFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ATTENUATION DE LUMIERE POUR AERONEF

Publication

EP 1241033 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00970422 A

Priority

  • UA 0000030 W
  • UA 99127024 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0147732A1] The invention relates to transport techniques and can be used for protecting passengers and a pilot in a cabin of an aircraft or another transport means against intense light, in addition to an auxiliary arrangement for moving mobile furniture elements. The dimming device comprises a blind and a mechanism for moving the blind, including guides for translational displacement of the blind and axial connecting elements of said mechanism. Intermediate non-rigid elements like, for example, a self-adhesive gearing band are arranged between contacting surfaces of the blind and the guides. The device ensures smooth displacement of the blind by means of decreasing friction force between the contacting elements and reduces noise occurring while the device is in use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60J 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 1/20 (2006.01); B64C 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B64C 1/1492 (2013.01); B60J 1/2011 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0147732 A1 20010705; WO 0147732 A8 20011101; WO 0147732 A8 20020627; BR 0014799 A 20020611; DE 60014434 D1 20041104; DE 60014434 T2 20051013; EP 1241033 A1 20020918; EP 1241033 A8 20021120; EP 1241033 B1 20040929; RU 2002113080 A 20040320; RU 2221707 C1 20040120; US 6688556 B1 20040210

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060817

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060817

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050808

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050808

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60014434 P 20041104

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-11-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTERAMI LTD.

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE