Global Patent Index - EP 1241048 A2

EP 1241048 A2 2002-09-18 - Lifting/tilting device for container

Title (en)

Lifting/tilting device for container

Title (de)

Hub/Kipp-Einrichtung für Container

Title (fr)

Dispositif de soulèvement/basculement pour conteneur

Publication

EP 1241048 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01104877 A

Priority

DE 10009821 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10009821A1] The container (12) for an electrically driven vehicle has a hydraulic cylinder (20) fitted to its base. This allows it to pivot between a horizontal and a vertical position about a horizontal axis (26).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Containeraufbau, insbesondere für ein Elektrokraftfahrzeug. Es ist vorgesehen, dass der Containeraufbau (12) mittels einer hydraulischen Hubkipp-Entlade-Vorrichtung (14) vertikal und/oder horizontal und um wenigstens eine Drehachse verschwenkbar gelagert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60P 1/16; B60P 1/30; B65F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/20 (2006.01); B65F 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/28 (2013.01); B65F 3/201 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10009821 A1 20010920; EP 1241048 A2 20020918; EP 1241048 A3 20030917

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050312

2004-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040315

2004-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DB REGIO AG

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60P 1/16 A

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60P 1/30 B

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65F 3/00 B

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DB CARGO AG

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI