Global Patent Index - EP 1241069 A1

EP 1241069 A1 2002-09-18 - Spring applied parking brake for railcars

Title (en)

Spring applied parking brake for railcars

Title (de)

Federkraftbetätigte Feststellbremse für Eisenbahwaggon

Title (fr)

Frein de stationnement à ressort pour wagons

Publication

EP 1241069 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02005275 A

Priority

  • CA 2370807 A
  • US 80970301 A

Abstract (en)

A spring applied parking brake for rail cars is provided and is operably connected to the train pneumatic brake systems. In a preferred embodiment the brake is automatically applied when brake pipe pressure falls below 2,758hPa (40psi) nominal. The pneumatic valving for the parking brake prevents application of the valve in an emergency braking situation, until the pressure has bled off in normal system leakage, preventing wheel damage. A handle is provided for manual application and release of the parking brake when desired. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61H 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 13/38 (2006.01); B61H 13/00 (2006.01); B61H 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61H 13/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241069 A1 20020918; BR 0201276 A 20021210; CN 1304235 C 20070314; CN 1400127 A 20030305; JP 2002331934 A 20021119; ZA 200200905 B 20021030

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021102

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI