Global Patent Index - EP 1241101 A1

EP 1241101 A1 2002-09-18 - Applicator tool for applying a packaging film

Title (en)

Applicator tool for applying a packaging film

Title (de)

Anbringwerkzeug zum Anbringen einer Verpackungsfolie

Title (fr)

Outil applicateur pour appliquer une feuille d'emballage

Publication

EP 1241101 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01106609 A

Priority

EP 01106609 A

Abstract (en)

An applicator tool for applying a packaging film, while unwinding it from a reel (3), of the type comprising a base (2) for supporting the reel (3) and a reel-holding spindle (5) fixedly attached to the base (2), further comprises at least one handle in a position proximal to an upper end of the spindle (5), in spacing relationship therefrom, forming a guiding rudder and a handgrip for the tool. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 67/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 67/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 67/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241101 A1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051027

2004-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COLOMBO, OTTAVIO

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030318

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI