Global Patent Index - EP 1241105 A1

EP 1241105 A1 2002-09-18 - Collapsible container

Title (en)

Collapsible container

Title (de)

Zusammenfaltbarer Behälter

Title (fr)

Conteneur pliable

Publication

EP 1241105 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02004929 A

Priority

  • EP 98928452 A
  • GB 9712151 A
  • GB 9721023 A

Abstract (en)

A container 10a is stackable on a like container but unable to nest with it. In this example, this first type of container has upright sides. Stacking means are provided to allow this first type of container to support a nesting container which is substantially the same size in plan but has slanting walls (to allow nesting) and therefore has a base which is smaller in plan than the mouth of the first container. The first type of container may be collapsible. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 21/06; B65D 6/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 6/18 (2006.01); B65D 21/032 (2006.01); B65D 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/068 (2013.01); B65D 11/1833 (2013.01); B65D 21/062 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9856668 A1 19981217; AU 8028398 A 19981230; DE 69811514 D1 20030327; DE 69811514 T2 20040219; DE 69833575 D1 20060427; DE 69833575 T2 20070118; EP 1009671 A1 20000621; EP 1009671 B1 20030219; EP 1241105 A1 20020918; EP 1241105 B1 20060301; ES 2192774 T3 20031016; ES 2260344 T3 20061101; GB 2340482 A 20000223; GB 2340482 B 20010606; GB 9927268 D0 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180610

2018-07-04 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180610

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150612

2016-02-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69833575

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110608

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090612

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090612

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080717

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2260344 T3

2006-06-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69833575 P 20060427

2006-03-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1009671 P

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2006-03-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-11-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINPAC MATERIALS HANDLING LIMITED

2004-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINPAC MOULDINGS LIMITED

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020913

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1009671

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT PT SE