Global Patent Index - EP 1241114 A1

EP 1241114 A1 2002-09-18 - Blank for a cigarette pack

Title (en)

Blank for a cigarette pack

Title (de)

Zuschnitt für eine Cigarettenpackung

Title (fr)

Flan pour boîte à cigarettes

Publication

EP 1241114 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02006112 A

Priority

  • DE 19730266 A
  • DE 19733604 A
  • EP 98940132 A

Abstract (en)

The package has an inner section and a casing (4) with front (12) and rear sides, a bottom (6) and a lid (8). Side sections (16,18) join the front and rear sides together, and a tear-open edge (10) is provided. The side sections contain fold lines formed by grooving beforehand. These allow the formation of semicircular folds in the inner section and casing. The grooves can extend for the full height of the side sections and parallel to the edges of the front and rear sides. Gluing lugs for the bottom and lid can be formed on the casing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Zuschnitt für eine Cigarettenpackung mit einem Innenteil (2) und einem Mantel (4), mit einer Vorderseite (12, 12'), einer Rückseite (14, 14'), einem Boden (6), einem Deckel (8) und mit die Vorderseite (12, 12') und die Rückseite (14, 14') verbindenden Seitenabschnitten (16, 16'; 18, 18') sowie mit einer Aufreißkante (10), wobei die Seitenabschnitte (16, 16'; 18, 18') mit vorgerillten Falzlinien (17) versehen sind, die eine halbrunde Faltung des Innenteils (2) und des Mantels (4) gestatten. Sie zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß oben und unten an die Seitenabschnitte (16' und 18') je vier dreiecksförmige Klebezungen (41) anschließen, deren Spitzen nach außen zeigen und die zur Verklebung mit dem Boden (6) bzw. dem Deckel (8) vorgesehen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/10; B65D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/24 (2006.01); A24F 15/00 (2006.01); B65B 19/22 (2006.01); B65D 5/02 (2006.01); B65D 5/66 (2006.01); B65D 85/10 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/0209 (2013.01); B65B 19/223 (2013.01); B65D 5/662 (2013.01); B65D 85/1045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0545723 A1 19930609 - PHILIP MORRIS PROD [US]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

US 6370846 B1 20020416; AR 010927 A1 20000712; AT 216972 T 20020515; AU 8855698 A 19990208; BG 104144 A 20001031; BG 63914 B1 20030630; CN 1262662 A 20000809; CN 1533951 A 20041006; CO 4840531 A1 19990927; DE 19880918 D2 20000531; EG 21600 A 20011231; EP 1019304 A1 20000719; EP 1019304 B1 20020502; EP 1241114 A1 20020918; ES 2173608 T3 20021016; GB 2341846 A 20000329; GB 2341846 B 20010912; GB 9930231 D0 20000209; HR P20000015 A2 20011031; HU 0004629 A2 20010428; HU 0004629 A3 20011128; HU 223335 B1 20040628; JP 2001509462 A 20010724; JP 3469873 B2 20031125; PL 338045 A1 20000925; PT 1019304 E 20021031; RO 120333 B1 20051230; RU 2219115 C2 20031220; SI 20067 A 20000430; SK 183799 A3 20000612; SK 283631 B6 20031104; TN SN98130 A1 20001229; TR 200000007 T2 20000721; TW 407119 B 20001001; WO 9902428 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030822

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2003-06-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: MK

2003-06-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: RO

2003-06-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: SI

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1019304

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: MK;RO;SI