Global Patent Index - EP 1241115 A1

EP 1241115 A1 2002-09-18 - Cigarette pack with wrapping foil and folded indicia carrier

Title (en)

Cigarette pack with wrapping foil and folded indicia carrier

Title (de)

Zigarettenpackung mit Aussenumhüllung aus Folie und gefaltetem Druckträger

Title (fr)

Paquet de cigarettes avec enveloppe extérieure et coupon imprimé plié

Publication

EP 1241115 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010987 A

Priority

  • DE 19807438 A
  • EP 99911692 A

Abstract (en)

A flip-top cigarette carton (10) is wrapped in a thin e.g. cellophane outer wrapper (24). A piece of printed fan-folded paper or card (30) is positioned between the wrapper (24) and the carton (10) flip-top (22). When the outer wrapper is removed, the fan-folded paper or card opens to reveal the printed message.

Abstract (de)

Packungseinheiten aus einer (Zigaretten-)Packung, insbesondere Klappschachtel (10) und einer Außenumhüllung (24) aus dünner, durchsichtiger Folie wird ein Druckträger (30) beigegeben, der zwischen der Klappschachtel (10) und Außenumhüllung (24) angeordnet ist, und zwar in (Zick-Zack-förmiger) Faltung. Der Druckträger (30) ist im Bereich einer Stirnwand (22) so positioniert, dass beim Öffnen der Außenumhüllung (24) eine selbsttätige Entfaltung stattfindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/1081 (2013.01); B65D 85/10 (2013.01); B65D 2203/00 (2013.01); B65D 2203/02 (2013.01); Y10S 206/831 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807438 A1 19990826; AU 3029399 A 19990906; BR 9908181 A 20001024; CN 1123506 C 20031008; CN 1291959 A 20010418; EP 1058663 A1 20001213; EP 1058663 B1 20021204; EP 1241115 A1 20020918; EP 1241115 B1 20040825; ID 27210 A 20010308; JP 2002503601 A 20020205; JP 4068303 B2 20080326; US 2003010656 A1 20030116; US 6401918 B1 20020611; US 6681927 B2 20040127; WO 9942387 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160220

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160220

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160220

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910366

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-09-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130209

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130212

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-10-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910366 P 20040930

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1058663 P

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1058663

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL