Global Patent Index - EP 1241120 A2

EP 1241120 A2 2002-09-18 - Method and device for detecting the presence of an object, in particular leaf or sheet formed objects for printing

Title (en)

Method and device for detecting the presence of an object, in particular leaf or sheet formed objects for printing

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erkennen des Vorhandenseins eines Objektes, vorzugsweise eines blatt- oder bogenförmigen Objektes für eine Bedruckung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de détection de la présence d'un objet, en particulier un objet en forme de feuille pour impression

Publication

EP 1241120 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01128560 A

Priority

DE 10112946 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves transporting the object past a sensor device, preferably a light barrier (4), to detect and register the leading edge of the object in the transport direction. After detecting the leading edge of the object at least one check is made of whether the object is still present in the sensor's measurement range. Independent claims are also included for the following: an arrangement for detecting presence of object, preferably sheet object for printing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Erkennen des Vorhandenseins eines Objektes, vorzugsweise eines blatt- oder bogenförmigen Objektes, auf einem Transportweg, insbesondere zur Vorbereitung und/oder Steuerung einer Bearbeitung des Objektes, bevorzugt für eine Bedruckung des Objektes in einer Druckmaschine, insbesondere einer digitalen Druckmaschine, wobei das Objekt auf dem Transportweg an einer Sensoreinrichtung, vorzugsweise einer Lichtschranke, für eine Erkennung und Registrierung der in Transportrichtung vorderen Kante des Objektes vorbeitransportiert wird. Des weiteren betrifft die Erfindung eine Vorrichtung zum Erkennen des Vorhandenseins eines Objektes, vorzugsweise zur Durchführung des vorgenannten Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 7/08; B65H 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/00 (2006.01); B65H 7/06 (2006.01); B65H 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 7/08 (2013.01); B65H 2511/11 (2013.01); B65H 2511/22 (2013.01); B65H 2511/51 (2013.01); B65H 2511/514 (2013.01); B65H 2513/42 (2013.01); B65H 2553/41 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1311 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/11 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/514 + B65H 2220/01
  3. B65H 2701/1311 + B65H 2220/01
  4. B65H 2513/42 + B65H 2220/01
  5. B65H 2511/51 + B65H 2220/03
  6. B65H 2511/22 + B65H 2220/03

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241120 A2 20020918; EP 1241120 A3 20040204; EP 1241120 B1 20070627; DE 10112946 A1 20020926; DE 50112661 D1 20070809; JP 2002274698 A 20020925; US 2002130461 A1 20020919

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50112661

- Effective date: 20130601

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080328

2007-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50112661 P 20070809

2007-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2007-06-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050621

2004-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2004-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI