Global Patent Index - EP 1241125 A1

EP 1241125 A1 2002-09-18 - Method to deal informations for elevator user

Title (en)

Method to deal informations for elevator user

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Vermittlung von Information für Aufzugsbenutzer

Title (fr)

Méthode pour communiquer des informations à un utilisateur d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 1241125 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02004844 A

Priority

  • EP 02004844 A
  • EP 01810256 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves providing information based on user-specific data for the current elevator user, whereby personally addressed information is not provided. The user is identified and the information to be provided is made available depending on the identification. Access to information takes place based on a personal information profile.

Abstract (de)

Bei dieser Struktur zur individuellen bzw. benutzerspezifischen Vermittlung von Information für Aufzugsbenutzer steht im Zentrum ein Gebäudeserver BUILDING SERVER, der als Datenverwalter agiert und an den unterschiedliche Datenquellen angeschlossen sind. Eine Identifikationseinheit IDENTIFICATION erfasst die persönlichen Daten eines Aufzugsbenutzer. Aufgrund der Daten wird dem Aufzugsbenutzer Information zur Verfügung gestellt. Als Datenquellen stehen Videos, Filme, Internet, Aufzugssteuerung, Gebäudeleitstelle. usw. zur Verfügung, wobei der Aufzugsbenutzer seine Information auf einem in der Aufzugsumgebung angeordneten touch screen entgegennehmen kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241125 A1 20020918; EP 1241125 B1 20100217

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-02 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20180220

2018-05-02 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20180220

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-13 [REG CH PLX] PATENT DECLARED INVALID FROM DATE OF GRANT ONWARDS

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-20 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50214208

2018-02-20 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 50214208

2018-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170304

2017-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 457953 T

- Effective date: 20170304

2017-06-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

- Effective date: 20101116

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-12-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

- Effective date: 20101116

2010-10-15 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1049140

2010-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214208 P 20100401

2010-02-26 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2010-02-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090305

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI