Global Patent Index - EP 1241150 A2

EP 1241150 A2 2002-09-18 - Process for producing mouldable, plastic-bound explosives or rocket propellants

Title (en)

Process for producing mouldable, plastic-bound explosives or rocket propellants

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung giessfähiger kunststoffgebundener Sprengladungen oder Raketentreibstoffe

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication et de moulage de charges explosives ou propulsives pour fusée, liées par des polymères

Publication

EP 1241150 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01129902 A

Priority

DE 10107948 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2003056865A1] The invention relates to a method of making pourable, plastic-bound explosive charges or rocket propellants, to which a metal powder having essentially spherically shaped grains is added. To avoid an increase in the viscosity of the explosive charge or the rocket propellant through polar groups attached to the surface of the metal powder, it is suggested according to the invention that the polar groups of the metal powder be saturated with SiR3 groups (Si=silane; R=organic residue) before the metal powder is added to the explosive mixture. As a result, the polar groups can no longer react with the isocyanates of the explosive charge or the rocket propellant and the specific surface of the respective metal powder, as well as the viscosity of the charges, is reduced.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung gießfähiger kunststoffgebundener Sprengladungen oder Raketentreibstoffen, denen ein Metallpulver zugesetzt wird, deren Pulverkörner eine im wesentlichen sphärische Form aufweisen. Um zu vermeiden, daß die Viskosität der Sprengladung oder des Raketentreibstoffes durch an der Oberfläche der Metallpulver angelagerte polare Gruppen zunimmt, schlägt die Erfindung vor, vor dem Einbringen des Metallpulvers in die Sprengstoffmischung ein Absättigen der polaren Gruppen des Metallpulvers durch SiR3-Gruppen (Si = Silane; R = organischer Rest) vorzunehmen. Dadurch können die polaren Gruppen nicht mehr mit den Isocyanaten der Sprengladung bzw. des Raketentreibstoffes reagieren und die spezifische Oberfläche des jeweiligen Metallpulvers sowie die Viskosität der Ladungen verringert sich.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06B 21/00; C06B 45/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 21/00 (2006.01); C06B 45/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 45/32 (2013.01); C06B 21/0025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10107948 A1 20020822; DE 50107360 D1 20051013; EP 1241150 A2 20020918; EP 1241150 A3 20031105; EP 1241150 B1 20050907; IL 148248 A 20070515; IL 148248 D0 20020912; NO 20016257 A 20020821; NO 20016257 D0 20011220; NO 321219 B1 20060403; US 2003056865 A1 20030327; US 6558488 B2 20030506

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151216

2016-08-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50107360 P 20051013

2005-09-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION GMBH

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040504

2003-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 06B 21/00 A

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 06B 45/32 B

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI