Global Patent Index - EP 1241271 A2

EP 1241271 A2 2002-09-18 - Process for granulating of slag

Title (en)

Process for granulating of slag

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Granulieren von Schlacken

Title (fr)

Procédé de granulation de laitier

Publication

EP 1241271 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450048 A

Priority

  • AT 4032001 A
  • AT 6452001 A

Abstract (en)

Process for granulating slag having a slag basicity CaO/SiO2 of less than 1 and an Al2O3 content of more than 6 wt.% involves bombarding a lance with conveying air in the pressure region of 0.5-3 bar; and blowing supplementary air into the cooling chamber via the casing of the cooling chamber. An Independent claim is also included for a device for carrying out the process comprising a lance (5) insulated in a temperature-resistant tube (3), and an impact crusher (10) connected to a cooling chamber (7). Preferred Features: The impact crusher has a rotor (11) which rotates coaxially to the axis of the cooling chamber.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Granulieren von Schlacken mit einer Schlackenbasizität CaO/SiO2 von kleiner 1 und einem Al2O3-Gehalt größer 6 Gew. % mit einem Schlackentundish und einer in den Schlackenaustritt mündenden Treibstrahllanze, wobei an den Schlackenaustritt ein Kühlraum angeschlossen ist, wird die Treibstrahllanze mit Förderluft im Druckbereich zwischen 0,5 und 3 bar beaufschlagt und über den Mantel des Kühlraumes Ergänzungsluft in den Kühlraum eingeblasen. Die Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß die Druckluftlanze (5) in einem temperaturbeständigen Rohr (3) isolierend angeordnet ist und daß an den im wesentlichen zylindrischen Kühlraum (7) eine Prallmühle (10) angeschlossen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 3/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241271 A2 20020918; EP 1241271 A3 20030115; AT 410099 B8 20030225; AT 410099 B 20030127; AT A6452001 A 20020615

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030913

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021213

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI