Global Patent Index - EP 1241272 A1

EP 1241272 A1 2002-09-18 - Device for granulating of melts

Title (en)

Device for granulating of melts

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Granulieren von Schmelzen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de granulation de fontes

Publication

EP 1241272 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02450049 A

Priority

AT 4062001 A

Abstract (en)

Device for granulating molten slag comprises a melting unit or tundish (1) having a slag flow regulating unit in the form of a height-adjustable weir (2). A groove (3) in the housing (5) has openings (4) in the base for receiving vapor nozzles. A line (10) for removing vapor and a sluice (14) for removing granules (13) are connected to the housing. Preferred Features: The vapor nozzles are formed as mixed nozzles connected to a line for vapor and a line for pressurized water. The lower side of the groove has an insulating layer and the nozzles are in the region of the layer.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Einrichtung zum Granulieren von Schmelzen, insbesondere flüssigen Schlacken unter Verwendung von Dampf, mit einem Schmelzaggregat oder Tundish (1), aus welchem die flüssige Schmelze in einen Granulierraum ausgetragen wird, weist das Schmelzaggregat bzw. der Tundish (1) eine Schlackenabflußregeleinrichtung in Form eines höhenverstellbaren Wehres (2) auf. An den Schmelzeaustritt schließt eine Rinne (3) aus feuerfestem Material an, wobei die Rinne (3) in einem geschlossenen Gehäuse (5) angeordnet ist und in ihrem Boden Öffnungen (4) für die Aufnahme von Dampfdüsen (16) aufweist und an das Gehäuse (5) wenigstens eine Leitung (15) für den Austrag von Dampf und eine Schleuse (14) für den Austrag von Granulat (13) angeschlossen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] GB 1127033 A 19680911 - BRITISH IRON STEEL RESEARCH
  • [A] DE 1066124 B
  • [A] FR 750610 A 19330814
  • [A] DE 918252 C 19540923 - FOAMSLAG LTD
  • [A] US 5667147 A 19970916 - EDLINGER ALFRED [CH]
  • [YA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 078 (C - 335) 27 March 1986 (1986-03-27)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 106 (C - 223) 18 May 1984 (1984-05-18)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 197824, Derwent World Patents Index; Class M24, AN 1978-42810A, XP002202251
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 050 (C - 007) 16 April 1980 (1980-04-16)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198244, Derwent World Patents Index; Class L02, AN 1982-94082E, XP002202260

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241272 A1 20020918; AT 410098 B 20030127; AT A4062001 A 20020615

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI