EP 1241274 A1 20020918 - Heat shielding apparatus for vertical continuous annealing furnace
Title (en)
Heat shielding apparatus for vertical continuous annealing furnace
Title (de)
Hitzeschild für vertikalen Durchlaufglühofen
Title (fr)
Ecran thermique pour four vertical pour le recuit en continu
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 01302309 A 20010313
Abstract (en)
A shielding apparatus for intercepting heat from a heating source disposed in a vertical continuous annealing furnace includes a double-walled tube (20) having an outside atmosphere suction port (23) projected horizontally or downward to be exposed to an outside atmosphere, and an exhaust port (25) projected upward to be exposed to the outside atmosphere. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
C21D 9/56 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C21D 9/562 (2013.01); C21D 9/563 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [AD] JP S53130210 A 19781114 - CHUGAI RO KOGYO KAISHA LTD
- [DY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 158 (C - 120) 19 August 1982 (1982-08-19)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 258 (C - 370) 4 September 1986 (1986-09-04)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 647 (C - 1283) 8 December 1994 (1994-12-08)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
BE DE FR GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1241274 A1 20020918; EP 1241274 B1 20051130; DE 60115379 D1 20060105; DE 60115379 T2 20060706
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01302309 A 20010313; DE 60115379 T 20010313