Global Patent Index - EP 1241274 A1

EP 1241274 A1 2002-09-18 - Heat shielding apparatus for vertical continuous annealing furnace

Title (en)

Heat shielding apparatus for vertical continuous annealing furnace

Title (de)

Hitzeschild für vertikalen Durchlaufglühofen

Title (fr)

Ecran thermique pour four vertical pour le recuit en continu

Publication

EP 1241274 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01302309 A

Priority

EP 01302309 A

Abstract (en)

A shielding apparatus for intercepting heat from a heating source disposed in a vertical continuous annealing furnace includes a double-walled tube (20) having an outside atmosphere suction port (23) projected horizontally or downward to be exposed to an outside atmosphere, and an exhaust port (25) projected upward to be exposed to the outside atmosphere. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 9/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/563 (2013.01); C21D 9/562 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AD] JP S53130210 A 19781114 - CHUGAI RO KOGYO KAISHA LTD
  • [DY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 158 (C - 120) 19 August 1982 (1982-08-19)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 258 (C - 370) 4 September 1986 (1986-09-04)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 647 (C - 1283) 8 December 1994 (1994-12-08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241274 A1 20020918; EP 1241274 B1 20051130; DE 60115379 D1 20060105; DE 60115379 T2 20060706

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *JFE STEEL CORP.

- Effective date: 20120331

2011-07-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110311

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110317

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060313

2006-11-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060313

2006-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60115379 P 20060105

2005-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2005-11-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041223

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JFE STEEL CORPORATION

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI