Global Patent Index - EP 1241286 A1

EP 1241286 A1 2002-09-18 - Underwear

Title (en)

Underwear

Title (de)

Miederware

Title (fr)

Sous-vêtement

Publication

EP 1241286 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01124346 A

Priority

  • JP 2001060323 A
  • JP 2001115763 A
  • JP 2001155544 A

Abstract (en)

To stimulate the skin and produce a massage effect and also promote reduction of subcutaneous fat and/or superfluous flesh by means of protruding parts (6) and recessed parts (7,8) formed on the inner surface of inner wear by varying the knit structure. Protruding parts and recessed parts having a different knit structure to one another are knitted alternately on the inner surface of the inner wear, with the recessed parts consisting of deep recessed parts (7) and shallow recessed parts (8) knitted alternately. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41B 9/00 (2006.01); D04B 1/10 (2006.01); D04B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/243 (2013.01); D04B 1/102 (2013.01); D04B 1/246 (2013.01); D04B 1/104 (2013.01); D10B 2403/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241286 A1 20020918; EP 1241286 B1 20030502; CN 1219926 C 20050921; CN 1356422 A 20020703; CN 2525106 Y 20021211; KR 100423673 B1 20040318; KR 20020071480 A 20020912; TW 527169 B 20030411

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-04-26 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20051203

2004-07-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: JULIUS BOOS JR. GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20040128

2003-10-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-09-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2003-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011115

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI