Global Patent Index - EP 1241291 A2

EP 1241291 A2 2002-09-18 - Spreading device for tubular textile fabrics

Title (en)

Spreading device for tubular textile fabrics

Title (de)

Rundausbreiter für textile Schlauchware

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'étalement des étoffes textiles tubulaires

Publication

EP 1241291 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004792 A

Priority

DE 10112045 A

Abstract (en)

A spreader for guiding a tubular fabric (7) has centering rings (10, 10') on both sides of a vacuum extraction nozzle (9), equal to or greater than the nozzle diameter. The rings are carried (6, 6') by internal sets of rollers (5, 5a, 5', 5a') that run against external driven rollers (8, 8') without any other support. The roller sets are arranged in a star shape and can be covered in pairs by drive aprons. <??>The roller carriers (3, 3') are adjustable so that the effective diameter of the spreader arrangement is equal to or greater than the internal diameter of the nozzle (9). A preliminary spreader ring (11) can be supported (6a) upstream from the first set of rollers.

Abstract (de)

Die Rundausbreiter (1) sind vor und hinter einer Ringschlitzdüse (9) angeordnet und haben zu gewährleisten, daß die Schlauchware (7) an der Ringschlitzdüse (9) anliegend faltenfrei und glatt ausgebreitet transportiert wird. Die Rundausbreiter (1) besitzen jeweils einen Spreizring (2), der innerhalb der Schlauchware (7) frei von jeder Befestigung gelagert ist, und einen an den Spreizringen (2) arretierten Zentrierring (10), die in Laufrichtung der Schlauchware (7) unmittelbar vor und hinter der Ringschlitzdüse (9) positioniert sind. Die Ringschlitzdüse (9) dient zur Entwässerung oder Naßveredlung von textiler Schlauchware durch Vakuumextraktion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 5/00; D06B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241291 A2 20020918; EP 1241291 A3 20040602; DE 10112045 A1 20020926; DE 10112045 B4 20061130; US 2002129473 A1 20020919; US 6550113 B2 20030422

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061220

2005-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040612

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06C 5/00 A

2004-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06B 15/04 B

2003-12-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WOLFGANG SUCHY

2003-12-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HELLWICH, HARTMUT, DIPL.-ING.

2003-12-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DR.-ING JOACHIM LABUDE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI