Global Patent Index - EP 1241297 A3

EP 1241297 A3 2003-06-25 - Device for cleaning a conveyor belt

Title (en)

Device for cleaning a conveyor belt

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Reinigen eines Transportbandes

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le nettoyage d'une bande transporteuse

Publication

EP 1241297 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02013119 A

Priority

  • DE 19712998 A
  • EP 98101519 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867560A2] The apparatus to clean a fourdrinier or blanket, at a papermaking machine, has at least one additional jet (23, 29) to deliver a fluid or gas cleaning medium into the suction zone (19) and/or the suction channel (15) of the apparatus. Preferably the additional jet (23) is mounted to the mantle (21) of the suction shrouding (13) round the suction zone (19), and its delivered jet stream is generally parallel to the inner mantle surface of the shrouding (13). A further additional jet (29) is at the end of the suction channel (15) towards the suction zone (19).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867560 A2 19980930; EP 0867560 A3 19990602; EP 0867560 B1 20030409; DE 19712998 A1 19981001; DE 19712998 C2 19990512; EP 1241297 A2 20020918; EP 1241297 A3 20030625; US 6051076 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050715

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 867560

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE