Global Patent Index - EP 1241298 A2

EP 1241298 A2 2002-09-18 - Vehicle, especially for cleaning beaches

Title (en)

Vehicle, especially for cleaning beaches

Title (de)

Fahrzeug, insbesondere zur Strandreinigung

Title (fr)

Véhicule, notamment pour le nettoyage des plages

Publication

EP 1241298 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005839 A

Priority

DE 10113702 A

Abstract (en)

The vehicle frame is divided into a front section (1) and a rear section (2), which are connected to each other by a buckle bearing (3) with vertical axis (K). A steering is provided for the rear wheels of rear axle (5) and one is also provided for the front wheels of the front axle (4). The vehicle drive may be a hydrostatic or electric all-wheel drive. The drive may also be a hybrid all-wheel drive in the form of a diesel-electric drive.

Abstract (de)

1. Fahrzeug, insbesonder zur Strandreinigung. 2.1. Ein Fahrzeug, insbesondere zur Strandreinigung, mit einem Fahrzeugrahmen, in dem eine Vorderradachse sowie eine Hinterradachse angeordnet sind, ist bekannt. 2.2. Erfindungsgemäß ist der Fahrzeugrahmen in einen Frontabschnitt und einen Heckabschnitt unterteilt, die durch eine Knicklagerung mit vertikaler Lenkachse miteinander verbunden sind. 2.3. Einsatz für Strandreinigungsfahrzeuge. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 12/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241298 A2 20020918; EP 1241298 A3 20040303; EP 1241298 B1 20110504; DE 10113702 A1 20021024; DE 10113702 B4 20080508; DE 50215032 D1 20110616; EP 2275603 A2 20110119; EP 2275603 A3 20110720; ES 2364127 T3 20110825; US 2002170765 A1 20021121; US 6805204 B2 20041019

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-31 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50215032

- Effective date: 20120207

2012-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120207

2011-08-30 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20110401521

- Effective date: 20110714

2011-08-25 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2364127 T3

- Effective date: 20110825

2011-06-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50215032

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50215032 P 20110616

2011-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040628

2004-11-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040628

2004-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI