Global Patent Index - EP 1241299 A2

EP 1241299 A2 2002-09-18 - Flood protection system for temporary use

Title (en)

Flood protection system for temporary use

Title (de)

Hochwasser-Abwehrsystem für temporären Einsatz

Title (fr)

Système de protection contre les crues pour l'utilisation temporaire

Publication

EP 1241299 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02405195 A

Priority

CH 5622001 A

Abstract (en)

The high-water protection system for temporary application comprises at least two vertical guide profiles (5) holding one or more horizontal panels (6, 7). Sealing elements are provided between the guide profiles and the panels together with clamping devices (8) which press the panels against the sealing elements. Sealing means are also provided between the panels and between the bottom panel (6) and the foundation.

Abstract (de)

Das Hochwasser-Abwehrsystem für das temporäre und mobile Abschotten von Gebäuden und Gebäude-Arealen gegen stehende und fliessende Gewässer, unabhängig von der jeweiligen Wasserhöhe und bei einem möglichen Dichtheitsgrad von 100% geeignet. Vertikale C-förmige Führungsprofile (5) weisen einen Führungskamm (21) auf und ermöglichen verschiedene Anbauarten, die zusammen mit Absperr-Paneelen (7) bzw. Bodenprofil (6) und Dichtungsprofilen (1 bis 4) eine Absperr-Einheit bzw. eine Schottwand bilden. Das nach dem Baukastensystem konzipierte Hochwasser-Abwehrsystem muss nicht zwingend an eine Wand bzw. Fassade angebaut werden, sondern es kann auch freistehend, als Palisaden, aufgestellt werden, unter der Voraussetzung, dass nach der jeweiligen Wasser-Absperrhöhe entsprechende Sockel (11 oder 12) mit dazugehöriger Bodenverankerung (13) Verwendung finden. Nach einer alternativen Ausführung ist vorgesehen, dass für die Abschottung von fliessenden Gewässern Prallschutz-Elemente (19) vor die dichte Paneelenwand positioniert werden, deren Aufgabe es ist, Geschiebe-Brocken, Holz, Unrat oder ähnliches, von den Dichtelementen fernzuhalten, wobei der Prallschutz bewusst wasser-durchlässig ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02B 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02B 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02B 3/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241299 A2 20020918; EP 1241299 A3 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030512

- Countries: MK

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030512

- Countries: RO

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030512

- Countries: SI

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030512

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 02B 3/10 A, 7E 02B 7/22 B

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI