Global Patent Index - EP 1241305 A1

EP 1241305 A1 2002-09-18 - Motor vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Motor vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugtürverschluss

Title (fr)

Serrure pour une porte de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1241305 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02005802 A

Priority

  • DE 20104625 U
  • DE 10130260 A

Abstract (en)

The door lock comprises a ratchet lever (6) which has a stop recess (12). The stop recess engages in an opening (9) in the counter-stop-face (7) in a form-locking manner, when the pawl (2) and/or actuating lever has been acted upon. The stop recess engages into the opening (9) in the counter-face-stop.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der vorliegenden Erfindung ist ein Kraftfahrzeugtürverschluss, mit einem Gesperre (1, 2) aus im Wesentlichen Drehfalle (1) und Sperrklinke (2). Ferner verfügt der Kraftfahrzeugtürverschluss über wenigstens einen Betätigungshebel (3) zum Auslösen des Gesperres (1, 2). Bei auf den Kraftfahrzeugtürverschluss wirkenden Fahrzeugbeschleunigungen verhindert ein Sperrhebel (6) für die Sperrklinke (2) und/oder den Betätigungshebel (3) eine unbeabsichtigte Öffnung des Gesperres (1, 2). Denn in einem solchen Fall schlägt der Sperrhebel (6) an ein Schlossblech (7) an. Erfindungsgemäß besitzt der Sperrhebel (6) eine Anschlagausnehmung (12), die im Blockadefall bei beaufschlagter(m) Sperrklinke (2) und/oder Betätigungshebel (3) in eine Öffnung (9) im Schlossblech (7) rastend eingreift. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241305 A1 20020918; EP 1241305 B1 20041110; AT 282128 T 20041115; ES 2227340 T3 20050401

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50201488

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090314

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090316

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090316

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090314

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-10-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227340 T3

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201488 P 20041216

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2004-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KIEKERT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2004-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI