Global Patent Index - EP 1241310 A1

EP 1241310 A1 2002-09-18 - Gate rail - self-cleaning sidesliding

Title (en)

Gate rail - self-cleaning sidesliding

Title (de)

Türschiene - selbstreinigende seitliche Verschiebung

Title (fr)

Rail de portail à coulissement lateral auto-nettoyant

Publication

EP 1241310 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290619 A

Priority

FR 0103361 A

Abstract (en)

The guide assembly for the sliding door (13) comprises a longitudinal receptacle (18) in the ground (14) transverse to the opening (10). Two spaced longitudinal elements (30,40) parallel to and above the receptacle form a rail. Spaced transverse elements (32) connect the rails together. The rails have free spaces between them so that particles supported on the rails are driven between the spaces by the lower end of the sliding door.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un ensemble de guidage destiné à supporter une paroi coulissante (13) dont l'extrémité inférieure est munie de galets, ladite paroi (13) étant susceptible d'obturer une ouverture (10) dont le bord inférieur est situé au niveau du sol (14) sur lequel est susceptible de reposer des particules (16). L'ensemble de guidage comprend : un réceptacle (18) longitudinal ménagé dans le sol (14) transversalement par rapport à ladite ouverture (10) ; au moins deux éléments longitudinaux (30, 34), espacés l'un de l'autre, disposés sensiblement parallèlement et au-dessus dudit réceptacle (18), l'un au moins desdits éléments longitudinaux (30, 34) formant rail ; des éléments transversaux (32) espacés les uns des autres pour relier lesdits éléments longitudinaux (30, 34) ensemble. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/06; E06B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01); E06B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 11/045 (2013.01); E05D 15/0686 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241310 A1 20020918; FR 2822188 A1 20020920; FR 2822188 B1 20031212

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051001

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030318

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI