Global Patent Index - EP 1241314 A2

EP 1241314 A2 2002-09-18 - Frameless tempered glass panel

Title (en)

Frameless tempered glass panel

Title (de)

Rahmenlose gehärtete Glasscheibe

Title (fr)

Vitre trempée sans encadrement

Publication

EP 1241314 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 02290632 A

Priority

  • DE 20112394 U
  • DE 10138464 A

Abstract (en)

The tempered glass (1) has a hooping element (5) applied to one of its edge peripheral faces. This element is composed of a steel cable which is placed in a groove (4) along the edge peripheral face.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une vitre trempée sans encadrement (1) dans laquelle, conformément à l'invention, un élément de cerclage (5) est appliqué sur au moins une de ses faces périphériques de chant. L'élément de cerclage (5) se compose de préférence d'un câble d'acier, qui est posé dans une rainure (4) disposée le long d'une face périphérique de chant de la vitre. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/02; E06B 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/02 (2006.01); E06B 7/22 (2006.01); E06B 7/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/02 (2013.01); E06B 7/231 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241314 A2 20020918; EP 1241314 A3 20030115; EP 1241314 B1 20050406; AT 292732 T 20050415; CZ 20020892 A3 20021016; CZ 301126 B6 20091111; DE 60203557 D1 20050512; DE 60203557 T2 20060302; DK 1241314 T3 20050808; ES 2240669 T3 20051016; PT 1241314 E 20050831; SK 287271 B6 20100507; SK 3392002 A3 20021008

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180313

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20180309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180313

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180307

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180312

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180312

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180314

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180314

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050406

2006-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060110

2005-11-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2240669 T3

2005-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-08-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050718

2005-08-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-07-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2005-07-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60203557 P 20050512

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2005-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050406

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI