Global Patent Index - EP 1241316 A2

EP 1241316 A2 2002-09-18 - Dismountable overhead door

Title (en)

Dismountable overhead door

Title (de)

Zerlegbare Kipptor-Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Porte basculante démontable

Publication

EP 1241316 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005888 A

Priority

DE 20104357 U

Abstract (en)

The door when close has narrow grooves in the front surface at the horizontal join between the slats. The top slat (110) has a flat top surface (110') and the bottom slat (113) has a flat bottom surface (113''). The two central slats (111,112) have shaped top and bottom surfaces and the edges of the slats (110a,113b) may slide in channels or rails in the walls.

Abstract (de)

Kipptor-Vorrichtung, wobei der Torflügel von einer Mehrzahl Paneele (110,111,112,113) gebildet ist, die an ihren oberen und unteren Begrenzungsflächen aneinander angrenzend übereinander angeordnet sind und sich jeweils über die Breite des Torflügels erstrecken. Die Paneele sind an ihren vertikalen Seitenflächen jeweils durch eine metallische Schiene (120) zu einer formstabilen Einheit zusammengefügt, wobei die Schiene von einem die Paneele an ihrer jeweiligen Innen- und Außenseite umfassenden U-Profil gebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/7003 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7044 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20104357 U1 20010621; EP 1241316 A2 20020918; EP 1241316 A3 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030416

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI