Global Patent Index - EP 1241319 A1

EP 1241319 A1 2002-09-18 - Safety device for a closure or solar protection and an actuating mechanism for such a device

Title (en)

Safety device for a closure or solar protection and an actuating mechanism for such a device

Title (de)

Sicherheitseinrichtung für eine Schliess- oder Sonnenschutzeinrichtung und Bedienungseinheit dieser Einrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour installation de fermeture ou de protection solaire et mécanisme de manoeuvre d'une telle installation

Publication

EP 1241319 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02356052 A

Priority

FR 0103632 A

Abstract (en)

The safety device comprises a shutter winding control mechanism (1) which includes a compensation spring (6) for the torque generated by the shutter weight. A flexible link(10) is subjected to a tension (T) which varies according to the spring state. The link can control rotational locking means (12) of the winding mechanism. An Independent claim is included for an operating mechanism for a solar protection installation

Abstract (fr)

Ce dispositif de sécurité pour installation de fermeture ou de protection solaire comprend un mécanisme (1) d'enroulement commandé d'un tablier, ce mécanisme incluant au moins un ressort (6) de compensation du couple généré par le poids du tablier. Il comprend un lien flexible (10) soumis à une tension (T) variable en fonction de l'état du ressort (6), ce lien (10) étant apte à commander, selon l'intensité de la tension (T), des moyens (12) de blocage en rotation (F1) du mécanisme d'enroulement (1) et/ou des moyens d'alerte. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/84; E05D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 13/00 (2006.01); E06B 9/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/84 (2013.01); E05D 13/1276 (2013.01); E05D 13/1292 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241319 A1 20020918; FR 2822190 A1 20020920; FR 2822190 B1 20031128

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080401

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061215

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI