Global Patent Index - EP 1241330 A2

EP 1241330 A2 2002-09-18 - Method for making an exhaust manifold and exhaust manifold made thereby

Title (en)

Method for making an exhaust manifold and exhaust manifold made thereby

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Abgaskrümmers sowie nach diesem Verfahren hergestellter Abgaskrümmer

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication d' un collecteur d' échappement et collecteur d'échappement produit par cette méthode

Publication

EP 1241330 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004709 A

Priority

DE 10112707 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10112707C1] To produce the exhaust manifold for an internal combustion motor, with a number of inlets from the cylinders and an outlet to the exhaust pipe, the part-shells (3-6) for the inner shell and the part-shells (1,2) for the outer shell are prefabricated. Each part-shell of the inner shell is fixed to a part-shell of the outer shell. The outer shell parts are joined together at the same time as the inner shell is formed by joining its part-shells. The outer shell parts are bonded together by a gas-tight seam.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines eine Mehrzahl von Abgaseintrittsöffnungen und mindestens eine Abgasaustrittsöffnung aufweisenden Abgaskrümmers, der eine aus mindestens zwei Teilschalen (3,4,5,6) zusammengefügte Innenschale, welche innerhalb einer und unter zumindest überwiegender Einhaltung eines Abstands zu einer aus mindestens zwei Teilschalen (1,2) zusammengefügten Außenschale angeordnet ist, umfaßt, weist folgende Schritte auf: Vorfertigen der Teilschalen (3,4,5,6;1,2) der Innenschale und der Außenschale; Fixieren jeder Teilschale (3,4;5,6) der Innenschale an einer Teilschale (1;2) der Außenschale; Zusammenfügen der Außenschale aus den zugehörigen Teilschalen (1,2)unter gleichzeitigem Zusammenfügen der Innenschale aus den zugehörigen Teilschalen (3,4,5,6); Fixieren der Teilschalen (1,2) der Außenschale zueinander unter Ausbildung einer gasdichten Naht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/10; B21D 53/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/88 (2006.01); F01N 13/10 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1877 (2013.01); B21D 53/88 (2013.01); F01N 13/102 (2013.01); F01N 13/1872 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 10112707 C1 20020606; EP 1241330 A2 20020918; EP 1241330 A3 20031008

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060419

2004-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040212

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI