Global Patent Index - EP 1241333 A2

EP 1241333 A2 2002-09-18 - Intake device for an internal combustion engine and method thereof

Title (en)

Intake device for an internal combustion engine and method thereof

Title (de)

Einlassvorrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine und Verfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Système d'admission pour un moteur à combustion interne et procédé associé

Publication

EP 1241333 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02005910 A

Priority

JP 2001076581 A

Abstract (en)

An intake device (100) of an internal combustion engine (1) is provided that includes an intake flow control valve (29) shaped so as to be capable of effectively forming a tumble flow within a combustion chamber (14) when there is a projection (27a) within an intake pipe (2) located downstream of the intake flow control valve (29). The intake device of the internal combustion engine (I) includes an intake flow control valve (29) between a throttle valve (24) provided within an intake pipe (2) and a fuel injector (27a) located downstream of the throttle valve, for producing a tumble flow in a combustion chamber (14). The intake flow control valve (29) includes a valve body (29v). The valve body (29v) has a bypass airflow producing portion formed at a position corresponding to that of the fuel injector (i.e., a projection within the intake pipe) when viewed in a flow direction of the airflow. The valve body (29v) is shaped to have a projection, thereby allowing an airflow formed by the intake flow control valve (29) to bypass the projection (27a) within the intake pipe (2) located downstream of the intake flow control valve (29).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 31/06; F02D 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 31/00 (2006.01); F02B 31/06 (2006.01); F02D 9/10 (2006.01); F02M 69/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/1015 (2013.01); F02B 31/06 (2013.01); F02D 9/101 (2013.01); Y02T 10/146 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H094474 A 19970107 - TOYOTA MOTOR CORP

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241333 A2 20020918; EP 1241333 A3 20090909; EP 1241333 B1 20111019; JP 2002276381 A 20020925; JP 3723086 B2 20051207; US 2002129786 A1 20020919; US 6712038 B2 20040330

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60241330

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60241330

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130306

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-02-14 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60241330

- Effective date: 20121213

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-11-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60241330

- Effective date: 20120720

2012-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120720

2012-01-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60241330

- Effective date: 20120112

2011-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2011-10-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-10-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HIRAKU, KEIZO

2011-10-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ANNOURA, TOSHIKI

2011-10-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SUZUKI, HIDEKI

2010-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091117

2009-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-09-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI