Global Patent Index - EP 1241347 A2

EP 1241347 A2 2002-09-18 - Fuel injection system for internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Fuel injection system for internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de carburant dans un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1241347 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004726 A

Priority

DE 10112432 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a fuel pump per cylinder connected to an injection valve, a first control valve for the connection between the pump's working chamber and a diversion control chamber and a second control valve for the pressure in a control pressure chamber that acts on a valve closure element in the closing direction. The diversion control chamber is a pressure reservoir in which a raised pressure is maintained relative to the fuel tank pressure. The device has a fuel pump (10) per cylinder connected to a fuel injection valve (12), a first electrically controlled valve (60) for controlling the connection between the pump's working chamber and a cut-off control chamber (62) and a second electrically controlled control valve (68) for controlling the pressure in a control pressure chamber that acts at least indirectly on a valve closure element in the closing direction. The cut-off control chamber is a pressure reservoir in which a raised pressure is maintained with respect to the pressure in the fuel tank (24).

Abstract (de)

Die Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung weist für für jeden Zylinder der Brennkraftmaschine eine Kraftstoffpumpe (10) auf, die einen durch die Brennkraftmaschine in einer Hubbewegung angetriebenen Pumpenkolben (18) aufweist, der einen Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) begrenzt, dem Kraftstoff aus einem Kraftstoffvorratsbehälter (24) zugeführt wird und der mit einem Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (12) verbunden ist, das ein Einspritzventilglied (28) aufweist, durch das wenigstens eine Einspritzöffnung (32) gesteuert wird und das durch den im Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) erzeugten Druck gegen eine Schließkraft in einer Öffnungsrichtung (29) bewegbar ist. Durch ein erstes elektrisch gesteuertes Steuerventil (60), wird eine Verbindung (59) des Pumpenarbeitsraums (22) mit einem Absteuerraum (62) gesteuert und durch ein zweites elektrisch gesteuertes Steuerventil (68) wird der in einem Steuerdruckraum (52) des Kraftstoffeinspritzventils (12) herrschende Druck gesteuert, durch den das Einspritzventilglied (28) zumindest mittelbar in Schließrichtung beaufschlagt ist. Der Absteuerraum (62) ist als Druckspeicher ausgebildet, in dem ein gegenüber dem im Kraftstoffvorratsbehälter (24) herrschenden Druck erhöhter Druck aufrechterhalten wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 45/12; F02M 45/00; F02M 45/06; F02M 47/02; F02M 59/36; F02M 61/20; F02M 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 45/02 (2006.01); F02M 45/04 (2006.01); F02M 45/06 (2006.01); F02M 45/12 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/04 (2013.01); F02M 45/00 (2013.01); F02M 45/02 (2013.01); F02M 45/04 (2013.01); F02M 45/06 (2013.01); F02M 45/12 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 59/366 (2013.01); F02M 61/205 (2013.01); F02M 63/0007 (2013.01); F02M 2200/40 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0957261 A2 19991117 - LUCAS IND PLC [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241347 A2 20020918; EP 1241347 A3 20040310; EP 1241347 B1 20060510; DE 10112432 A1 20020919; DE 50206716 D1 20060614; US 2002129792 A1 20020919; US 6651626 B2 20031125

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070213

2006-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-08-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206716 P 20060614

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-05-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060510

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-12-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/12 A

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/00 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/06 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 47/02 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/36 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 63/00 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/20 B

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI