Global Patent Index - EP 1241352 A1

EP 1241352 A1 2002-09-18 - Hydraulic motor or pump with means for rotationally connecting two housing parts

Title (en)

Hydraulic motor or pump with means for rotationally connecting two housing parts

Title (de)

Hydraulischer Motor oder Pumpe mit Mitteln zur Rotationsverbindung von zwei Gehäuseteilen

Title (fr)

Moteur ou pompe hydraulique avec des moyens de solidarisation en rotation

Publication

EP 1241352 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290618 A

Priority

FR 0103590 A

Abstract (en)

The hydraulic pump or motor has a first section (1C) with a crankcase and part of the cylinder block (2) and a second section (1B) connected together to transmit rotary forces between them. There are two connection assemblies (20,30) each with aligned holes in each section and balls (22) fitting into the holes to prevent contact between the contact faces of the sections when the balls are in place. Under axial load, the balls cause plastic deformation of the sections for assembly.

Abstract (fr)

Moteur ou pompe hydraulique comprenant une première et une deuxième pièce (1C, 1B; 1C, 1D) formant des parties de carter et un système pour solidariser ces deux pièces en rotation de manière à permettre le passage d'un couple entre elles. Le système comprend au moins deux ensembles de solidarisation en rotation (20 ; 30) comprenant chacun deux perçages alignés respectivement pratiqués dans chacune des deux pièces et un organe de cisaillement (22) s'étendant dans ces perçages. Cet organe et ces perçages présentent des dimensions respectives à l'état libre ne permettant pas le contact entre les faces de contact (1C', 1B' ; 1C", 1D") lorsque l'organe de cisaillement est disposé dans ces perçages. Du fait de l'application d'une contrainte axiale, cet organe coopère sans jeu avec les perçages et une déformation dans le domaine de déformation plastique homogène est opérée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04; F03C 1/04; F03C 1/247; F04B 53/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03C 1/04 (2006.01); F03C 1/247 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 53/16 (2013.01); F03C 1/0403 (2013.01); F03C 1/247 (2013.01); F04B 1/0404 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241352 A1 20020918; EP 1241352 B1 20040825; DE 60201038 D1 20040930; DE 60201038 T2 20051020; FR 2822197 A1 20020920; FR 2822197 B1 20030627

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150312

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150312

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60201038

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140317

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140311

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-01-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60201038 P 20040930

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FONTAINE, JACQUES

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VIDAL, STEPHANE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI