Global Patent Index - EP 1241357 A1

EP 1241357 A1 2002-09-18 - Pump unit

Title (en)

Pump unit

Title (de)

Pumpaggregat

Title (fr)

Groupe de pompage

Publication

EP 1241357 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02005483 A

Priority

DE 10111739 A

Abstract (en)

Pump unit for hydrodynamic pumping of a medium (M) has a centrifugal pump, with a motor drive (2) and housing, a temperature sensor (3) and a heater element (4). The heater element and temperature sensor are arranged outside the medium carrying component with a thermal connection between the sensor and heater element provided by an opening in the pump housing with a bolt (6) inside it acting as a heat conductor. When the temperature sensor detects a too high temperature in the pumped medium it switches off the pump. Insufficient circulating medium or the medium circulating being too hot causes such a temperature.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Pumpaggregat mit einer Kreiselpumpe, umfassend ein Pumpengehäuse, mit einem Motorantrieb in einem Motorgehäuse, und mit einem Temperatursensor zum hydrodynamischen Pumpen eines Mediums (M); Die Erfindung ist gekennzeichnet durch die folgenden Merkmale: Es ist ein Heizelement vorgesehen, das in thermisch leitender Verbindung mit dem Temperatursensor steht; das Heizelement und der Temperatursensor sind an einem mediumführenden Bauteil außerhalb des Motorgehäuses über einen als Temperaturfühler ausgebildeten Bolzen, der in eine Öffnung des Bauteils hereinragt, so angeordnet, dass eine thermisch leitende Verbindung zwischen dem Medium und dem Temperatursensor hergestellt ist; der Temperatursensor ist derart mittels einer elektrischen Schaltung mit dem Motorantrieb verschaltet, dass der Motorantrieb bei einer vom Temperatursensor erfassten Temperatur oberhalb eines vorgegebenen Temperaturwerte ausgeschaltet wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 15/02; F04B 49/02; F04B 49/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/0209 (2013.01); F04D 29/588 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1241357 A1 20020918; DE 10111739 A1 20021002

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081001

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GARDENA MANUFACTURING GMBH

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR NL

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI